HB0270 (CH0386)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Environment - Testing for Lead in Drinking Water - Public and Nonpublic Schools

Sponsored by:

Delegate Lafferty

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386


Synopsis:Requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with the State Department of Education, the Department of General Services, and Maryland Occupational Safety and Health, to adopt regulations, under specified circumstances, to require periodic testing for the presence of lead in drinking water outlets in occupied public or nonpublic school buildings; requiring the Department of the Environment, before adopting regulations, to gather specified information regarding the establishment of lead-free school environments; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Lafferty, Platt, Bromwell, Glenn, Hettleman, Lierman, McIntosh, Oaks, Rosenberg, M. Washington, Hayes, Ali, Ebersole, Mosby, Turner, and Wilkins
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Environment
Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Chemical Tests
Education, State Department of
Environment, Department of
General Services, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances -see also- Asbestos; Radiatn
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Water
Statutes:Article - Environment
(6-1501, 6-1502)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20171/23/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
1/25/20171/25/2017Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
3/20/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/20/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments {690012/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/20/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (117-23)51
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20173/29/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)63A
House4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed69
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:59 P.M.