HB0278 (CH0127)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Binding Arbitration – Revisions MC 14–18

Sponsored by:

Montgomery County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127


Synopsis:Requiring an employee organization certified as exclusive representative to disclose to certain employees all offers regarding wages made by the Housing Opportunities Commission of Montgomery County during certain negotiations; authorizing the parties to use a certain mediator-arbitrator panel in a collective bargaining impasse; requiring the mediator-arbitrator panel to first consider and give the highest priority to the ability of the Montgomery Commission to pay for certain expenses under certain circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Montgomery County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Economic and Community Development
Narrow Subject(s):Arbitration -see also- Mediation
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Disclosure
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condos; Mobile & Manuf Homes
Montgomery County
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Housing and Community Development
(16-310, 16-311, 16-308.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 4:42 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/19/20181/19/2018First Reading Appropriations
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/17/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {624162/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate A. Miller) Adopted47A
Motion Reconsider Committee Amendment (Delegate A. Miller) Adopted47A
Committee Amendment Withdrawn47A
Substitute Committee Amendment {824465/1 Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable Report by Finance
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
3/30/20183/27/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)58
House4/2/20183/24/2018Returned Passed58
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 1:05 P.M.