HB0281 (CH0358)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Computer Science - Curriculum and Professional Development (Securing the Future: Computer Science Education for All)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Miller, A.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358


Synopsis:Requiring county boards to require public high schools to offer at least one high-quality computer science course beginning in the 2021-2022 school year; establishing the Maryland Center for Computing Education to identify ways to expand access to high-quality computer science education, strengthen the skills of educators, and increase the number of computer science teachers; requiring the Center to work with certain institutions of higher education; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates A. Miller, Dumais, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gibson, Hill, Jalisi, Korman, Krimm, Lam, J. Lewis, Lierman, McCray, McIntosh, Moon, Rose, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Valderrama, and M. Washington
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Community Colleges
Continuing Education -see also- Job Training
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Curriculum
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Governor
Grants
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Job Training -see also- Continuing Education
Local Government Mandates
Minorities -see also- Women
Public Schools
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Statutes:Article - Education
(12-118, 4-111.4)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(6-226)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 3:26 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/19/20181/19/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/25/20181/25/2018Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2/26/20182/26/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2/27/20182/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {285465/1 Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
3/1/20183/1/2018Third Reading Passed (135-1)37
Senate3/2/20183/2/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs38
3/15/20183/15/2018Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments {884035/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments61A
House Requests Senate Recede61A
Conference Committee Appointed61A
Delegates Luedtke, M. Washington, and Afzali61A
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Motion Recede (Senator Pinsky) Adopted64
Committee Amendment {884035/1 Withdrawn64
Senate Recede64
Third Reading Passed (44-0)64
House4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.