HB0296

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Correctional Officers

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

In the House - Passed Enrolled


Synopsis:Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax under certain circumstances for a certain amount of retirement income attributable to certain employment as a correctional officer; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Hixson, Ali, Barkley, Beidle, Buckel, Chang, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, C. Howard, Kaiser, Kipke, Kramer, Luedtke, Patterson, Reilly, Rosenberg, Shoemaker, Tarlau, Turner, A. Washington, Afzali, D. Barnes, Hornberger, Jalisi, Long, Mosby, Rose, Simonaire, Walker, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Correctional Officers
Exemptions
Income Tax
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-209)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 11:06 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/22/20181/22/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/24/20181/24/2018Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {995769/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (131-0)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {989134/1 Report Adopted62A
Floor Amendment {863225/2 (Senator Peters) Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/7/20183/30/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (138-0)64
Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 7, 2018 2:39 P.M.