HB0298 (CH0413)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Student Data Privacy Act of 2015

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kaiser

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413


Synopsis:Requiring specified operators of specified Internet sites, services, and applications to protect PreK-12 student information from unauthorized access, implement and maintain security procedures and practices, and delete student specified information under specified circumstances; prohibiting specified operators from knowingly engaging in specified activities with respect to specified sites, services, and applications related to targeted advertising, selling, and disclosing student information under specific circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Kaiser, Aumann, B. Barnes, Carr, Chang, Cullison, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Ghrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Jackson, Jones, Krebs, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, McComas, McCray, McDonough, McIntosh, Moon, Morhaim, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Simonaire, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, B. Wilson, C. Wilson, P. Young, Zucker, Barron, C. Howard, Patterson, Afzali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Fennell, Hornberger, Luedtke, Metzgar, Platt, Reilly, and Shoemaker
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Advertising
Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Electronic Government
Identification
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Privacy
Private Schools
Public Schools
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Students
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Statutes:Article - Education
(4-131)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:41 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/4/20152/4/2015First Reading Ways and Means
2/5/20152/5/2015Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20153/18/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/19/20153/16/2015Favorable with Amendments {765560/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/20/20153/19/2015Third Reading Passed (122-13)49
Senate3/23/20153/20/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47A
3/24/20153/24/2015Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20154/10/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20154/3/2015Favorable with Amendments {594936/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/11/20154/4/2015Floor Amendment (Senator Rosapepe) {343523/1 Adopted62
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)62
House4/13/20154/7/2015House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Third Reading Passed (128-11)68
Passed Enrolled68
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:41 P.M.