HB0301 (CH0362)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2018)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Atterbeary

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362


Synopsis:Providing that, in a prosecution for certain sexual offenses, evidence that the defendant committed sexually assaultive behavior before or after the offense for which the defendant is on trial may be admissible for certain reasons; requiring that the State file a motion of intent to introduce evidence of sexually assaultive behavior at least 90 days before the trial or at a later time under certain circumstances; requiring the State to provide a copy of a certain motion to the defendant; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Atterbeary, Ali, Anderson, Angel, D. Barnes, Barron, Bromwell, Carozza, Clark, Cluster, Conaway, Corderman, Cullison, Davis, Fennell, Folden, Gibson, Glass, Glenn, Hettleman, Hill, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jameson, Kelly, Kittleman, Knotts, Kramer, Krebs, Krimm, McComas, McConkey, McCray, McIntosh, McKay, A. Miller, W. Miller, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Otto, Parrott, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Queen, Rose, Rosenberg, Saab, Sanchez, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, A. Washington, West, Wilkins, Wilson, P. Young, Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Fisher, Flanagan, Ghrist, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Malone, Mautz, McDonough, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Reilly, Rey, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Vogt, and Wivell
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0270
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Evidence
Hearings
Sexual Offenses
Trials
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(10-923)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 3:28 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/22/20181/22/2018First Reading Judiciary
1/19/20181/19/2018Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {172019/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48B
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.