HB0309 (CH0070)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County - Practice of Massage - Regulation

Sponsored by:

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70


Synopsis:Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County, after consultation with the State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners, to adopt ordinances or regulations relating to verification, inspection, and display of certain licenses issued under certain provisions of law; and requiring the governing body of Anne Arundel County to provide that the Anne Arundel County Health Officer and the Anne Arundel County Police Department have the authority to carry out the ordinances or regulations adopted under certain provisions of law.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Anne Arundel County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Health Occupations
Narrow Subject(s):Anne Arundel County
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
County Administrators
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Laws and Ordinances -see also- Pub Local Laws; Uniform Laws
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Massage
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Statutes:Article - Health Occupations
(6-405)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 4:40 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/22/20181/22/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/24/20181/24/2018Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
1/25/20181/25/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20/20182/20/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2/21/20182/21/2018Favorable with Amendments {916184/1 Report Adopted31
Second Reading Passed with Amendments31
2/23/20182/23/2018Third Reading Passed (131-0)33
Senate2/26/20182/26/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs34
3/15/20183/15/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 1:00 P.M.