HB0315 (CH0560)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Department of Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Funding (Maryland Cares for Kids Act)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560


Synopsis:Repealing the requirement that the State Board of Education adopt and publish standards for the administration of a subsidized feeding program; authorizing a nonpublic school that participates in the Federal School Breakfast Program or the National School Lunch Program to participate in the State free feeding program; requiring the State to be responsible for reimbursing certain nonpublic schools; requiring the State to be responsible for reimbursing a county board or a participating nonpublic school for the student share of costs; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Hixson, Ali, Angel, Barkley, Barve, Beidle, Branch, Chang, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gibson, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Healey, Hettleman, C. Howard, Jones, Korman, Kramer, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Reznik, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Tarlau, Turner, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, P. Young, Jalisi, Sophocleus, and Kaiser
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0288 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Food -see also- Kosher; Meat, Poultry, Seafood; Milk
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Reimbursement Rates
Students
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-601 through 7-605, 7-701 through 7-703)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 21, 2018 2:52 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/22/20181/22/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/25/20181/25/2018Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {905760/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (118-20)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {829936/1 Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)59
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61
Third Reading Passed (117-20)61
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:36 P.M.