HB0332

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Montgomery County - Maximum Speed Limits Outside Urban Districts MC 23-17

Sponsored by:

Montgomery County Delegation

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Decreasing the lowest maximum speed limit that Montgomery County may establish for a highway outside an urban district under specified circumstances from 25 miles an hour to 20 miles an hour.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Montgomery County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Narrow Subject(s):Highways
Montgomery County
Traffic Regulation
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(21-803)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 31, 2017 9:29 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20171/25/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/14/20172/14/2017Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/20/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments {850714/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/20/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (101-39)51
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings46A
3/21/20173/21/2017Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:10 A.M.