HB0372 (CH0352)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Korman

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352


Synopsis:Requiring the Secretary of Transportation to withhold a portion of the State's annual operating grant to the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority under certain circumstances; requiring the Department of Transportation to provide an annual grant of at least $167,000,000 to pay capital costs of the Authority; requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to prepare a Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan in consultation with certain entities; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Korman, Barron, Angel, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Carr, Chang, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Sanchez, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, Wilkins, and K. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0277
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on federal, state, or local action
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee Hearing
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Transportation - Generally
Capital Budget
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Anne Arundel County
Appropriations
Assessments
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Bridges and Tunnels
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Buses -see also- School Buses
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Communications -see also- Electronic Comm; Language; Telecom
Commuters -see also- Car Pools
District of Columbia
Driver Education
Excise Tax
Grants
Harford County
Howard County
Interstate Affairs
Mass Transit -see also- Buses; Railroads
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Notices
Parking
Pedestrians
Railroads
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Sunset
Time
Transportation, Department of
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Zoning and Planning
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(10-205, 3-216, 7-205, 7-301.1, 7-309)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


June 15, 2018 11:54 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {594361/1 Report Adopted40
Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted 40
3/7/20183/7/2018Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (97-41)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation43
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments {979130/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
3/30/20183/27/2018Floor Amendment {173721/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted58
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)58
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61
Third Reading Passed (96-41)61
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/25/20184/25/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 25, 2018 4:52 P.M.