HB0375 (CH0417)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers

Sponsored by:

Delegate Cullison

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417


Synopsis:Establishing the Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health Centers; requiring the Council to study and make recommendations on improving the health and educational outcomes of students who receive services from school-based health centers; authorizing the State Department of Education to seek the assistance of specified organizations to provide specified staffing resources; requiring the Council to report to specified entities on its findings and recommendations on or before December 31 of each year; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Cullison, Hammen, Hayes, McMillan, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Miele, Saab, Kelly, McDonough, Bromwell, Morgan, Morhaim, Pendergrass, Kipke, Sample-Hughes, Barron, Reznik, West, Rose, Hill, Krebs, and K. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0403
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Dentists
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health Care Facilities -see also- Clinics; Hospices; etc
Mental Health
Public Schools
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-4A-01, 7-4A-02, 7-4A-03, 7-4A-04, 7-4A-05)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:42 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/11/20152/11/2015Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20153/20/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/20/20153/18/2015Favorable with Amendments {246485/148
Special Order until later today (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted 48
Favorable with Amendments {246485/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/23/20153/21/2015Third Reading Passed (136-4)51
Senate3/23/20153/20/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47A
4/9/20154/9/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20154/3/2015Favorable with Amendments {734339/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/11/20154/4/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)62
House4/13/20154/8/2015House Concur - Senate Amendments69
Third Reading Passed (131-8)69
Passed Enrolled69
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:42 P.M.