HB0383

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Development and Implementation

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Requiring the State Board of Education and specified nonpublic schools to develop and implement a specified program relating to sexual abuse and assault awareness and prevention; and requiring a specified program to be incorporated into the health curriculum of each county board of education and each nonpublic school.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Luedtke and Patterson
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0489
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Health -see also- Mental Health
Job Training
Private Schools
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Teachers
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-437)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:42 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Ways and Means
2/9/20152/9/2015Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20153/12/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/13/20153/13/2015Favorable with Amendments {275760/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/17/20153/14/2015Third Reading Passed (138-2)44
Senate3/18/20153/18/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs45
4/9/20154/9/2015Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:42 P.M.