HB0410 (CH0129)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland-Washington Regional District - Prince George's County - Municipal Authority PG/MC 108-18

Sponsored by:

Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129


Synopsis:Repealing certain provisions of law authorizing a municipal corporation in Prince George's County to enact certain local laws regulating fences; repealing certain provisions of law prohibiting the enactment of a local law that is not less restrictive than certain local laws; authorizing the legislative body of a municipal corporation in Prince George's County to authorize the erection of a fence that exceeds certain height restrictions or limitations under certain circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB1570 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Counties - Local Laws
Bi-County Agencies
Municipalities
Narrow Subject(s):Boundaries
Laws and Ordinances -see also- Pub Local Laws; Uniform Laws
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Prince George's County
Signs and Billboards
Zoning and Planning
Statutes:Article - Land Use
(22-203, 25-101, 25-303)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 4:42 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
3/1/20183/1/2018Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/17/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {990813/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48B
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 1:05 P.M.