HB0412 (CH0264)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Assessments - Administration and Provision of Information

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kaiser

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264


Synopsis:Extending to the 2018-2019 school year the period of time by which the State Department of Education is required to develop a specified assessment in the State's adopted curricula for a core content area; requiring each county board of education to provide information relating to each assessment administered in a local school system that includes the title, purpose, grade level or subject area tested, testing window, and accommodations for students with special needs; requiring this information be updated annually; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Kaiser, Ebersole, Haynes, Hettleman, Kramer, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Morales, Morhaim, Turner, Valentino-Smith, Zucker, Afzali, Fennell, Patterson, and Tarlau
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0533
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Examinations
Reports
Special Education
Students
Time
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-203, 7-203.3)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20161/29/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/3/20162/3/2016Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2/4/20162/4/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20163/16/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {825069/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/19/20163/17/2016Third Reading Passed (135-0)49
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48A
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20163/31/2016Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed (35-11)61
House4/7/20164/1/2016Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:59 P.M.