HB0413 (CH0400)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Special Education - Individualized Education Program Parental Notice Requirements and Service Models List

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400


Synopsis:Requiring the parents of a child attending their initial individualized education program evaluation meeting to be provided a specified verbal and written explanation of their rights and responsibilities and a program procedural safeguards notice and providing the right for the parents to request this information at any meeting thereafter; requiring that a specified verbal and written explanation be given in plain language; requiring the State Department of Education to adopt regulations; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Luedtke, Kaiser, A. Washington, F. Turner, Howard, and Cardin
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Ways and Means   View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Guardians
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notices
Public Information
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Rules and Regulations
Special Education
Students
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:49 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20141/24/2014First Reading Ways and Means
1/29/20141/29/2014Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/3/20143/3/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/4/20143/4/2014Favorable with Amendments {925260/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/6/20143/6/2014Third Reading Passed (136-0)42
Senate3/7/20143/7/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs41
3/12/20143/12/2014Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20143/23/2014Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/2/20143/24/2014Third Reading Passed (46-0)58
House4/3/20143/27/2014Returned Passed63
Post Passage5/5/20145/5/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:49 P.M.