HB0427 (CH0033)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools – Student Sunscreen Use – Policy

Sponsored by:

Delegate Young, K.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33


Synopsis:Requiring each county board of education to adopt a certain written policy to authorize a student to possess and use sunscreen on school property or at a school-sponsored activity without written permission from a health care provider; and requiring each county board to encourage public schools to educate students about sunscreen, sun safety, and the policy established under the Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates K. Young, Barkley, Barron, Barve, Brooks, Carr, Cullison, Ebersole, Gibson, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Hill, Korman, Krebs, Lisanti, Luedtke, McMillan, Miele, Pendergrass, Proctor, Robinson, Rose, Sample-Hughes, Turner, Vogt, M. Washington, West, and Healey
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0217
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Public Schools
Safety -see also- Cybersecurity; Occupational Safety
Students
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-441)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 4:34 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/25/20181/25/2018Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2/19/20182/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2/20/20182/20/2018Favorable with Amendments {465162/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/22/20182/22/2018Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted32
Floor Amendment {493722/1 (Delegate Healey) Adopted32
Second Reading Passed with Amendments32
2/27/20182/27/2018Third Reading Passed (135-0)35
Senate2/28/20182/28/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs36
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
House4/3/20183/25/2018Returned Passed59
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:59 P.M.