HB0429 (CH0163)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Physical Resistance

Sponsored by:

Delegate Dumais

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163


Synopsis:Establishing that evidence of physical resistance by a victim is not required to prove that a sexual crime was committed; establishing that a specified provision of the Act may not be construed to affect the admissibility of evidence of actual physical resistance by a victim of a sexual crime; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Dumais, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barron, Beidle, Bromwell, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, C. Howard, Jackson, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Kittleman, Korman, Krebs, Lafferty, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, Malone, McComas, McIntosh, Metzgar, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Queen, Rey, Reznik, Robinson, Rose, Sanchez, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, West, B. Wilson, C. Wilson, K. Young, and P. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0217
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Evidence
Sexual Offenses
Victims -see also- Criminal Injuries Compensation
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(3-319.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 26, 2017 1:48 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20171/26/2017First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20173/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable with Amendments {272117/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/9/20173/9/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)42
Senate3/10/20173/10/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings41
3/30/20173/30/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed55
4/7/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed (45-0)61
House4/7/20173/31/2017Returned Passed65
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:10 A.M.