HB0430 (CH0563)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jones

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563


Synopsis:Requiring the Governor to include in the State budget a certain appropriation from all fund sources for the Child Care Subsidy Program each fiscal year; requiring the Governor to appropriate funds from all fund sources in the State budget to increase the Child Care Subsidy Program reimbursement rates to a certain amount in certain fiscal years; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Jones, McIntosh, B. Barnes, Cullison, Ebersole, Frush, Gaines, Glenn, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hettleman, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, Patterson, Pendergrass, Proctor, Queen, Sample-Hughes, Valderrama, K. Young, P. Young, Chang, Ciliberti, Jackson, A. Miller, Reznik, Sophocleus, Valentino-Smith, and Vogt
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0379
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Education - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Child Care
Reimbursement Rates
Statutes:Article - Education
(1-101, 9.5-111)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 4:30 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Appropriations
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {954262/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (100-36)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
3/30/20183/27/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)58
House4/2/20183/24/2018Returned Passed58
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:37 P.M.