HB0442

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education – Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Instruction in Public and Nonpublic High Schools

Sponsored by:

Delegate Queen

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Encouraging a county board of education to provide age-appropriate instruction on organ and tissue donation and registration in the public high schools in the county; specifying the purposes and goals of the instruction are to describe certain benefits, address the myths and misconceptions, and explain the options available to minors and adults related to organ and tissue donation; and encouraging nonpublic high schools to provide certain instruction on organ and tissue donation.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Queen, Conaway, Hill, Hornberger, Kelly, Lam, Luedtke, Morhaim, Platt, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Organ Donorship
Private Schools
Public Schools
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-441)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 2:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20181/25/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/30/20181/30/2018Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2/22/20182/22/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2/23/20182/23/2018Favorable with Amendments {915268/1 Report Adopted33
Second Reading Passed with Amendments33
2/27/20182/27/2018Third Reading Passed (134-2)35
Senate2/28/20182/28/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs36
3/15/20183/15/2018Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 23, 2018 6:36 P.M.