HB0518 (CH0668)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Health - Prenatal HIV Testing

Sponsored by:

Delegate Morhaim

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668


Synopsis:Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with stakeholders, to adopt regulations establishing requirements for prenatal HIV testing; requiring providers of prenatal medical care to follow the Department's requirements for prenatal HIV testing; requiring the Department to provide the requirements established for prenatal HIV testing to hospitals that offer obstetric services and specified organizations; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Morhaim, Kelly, and West
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Chemical Tests
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Counselors -see also- Guidance Counselors; Social Workers
Discipline
Diseases -see also- AIDS; Rabies
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health Care Facilities -see also- Clinics; Hospices; etc
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Hospitals -see also- Clinics; State Hospitals
Notices
Physicians -see also- Dentists; Med Exmnrs; Psych; etc
Pregnancy
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Women -see also- Gender
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(18-338.2)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/27/20171/27/2017First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/8/20173/8/2017Favorable with Amendments {506889/1 Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/10/20173/10/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)43
Senate3/13/20173/13/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs42
3/15/20173/15/2017Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/20173/29/2017Favorable with Amendments {244738/1 Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/5/20173/30/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)59
House4/8/20174/1/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (134-0)66
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 668

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:01 P.M.