HB0532

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Place

Sponsored by:

Delegate Reznik

Status:

In the House - Returned Passed


Synopsis:Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to authorize the General Assembly to allow a qualified individual to register and vote at a precinct polling place on Election Day; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Reznik, Barkley, Cullison, Ebersole, Frick, Frush, Gibson, Hixson, Jones, Kaiser, Korman, Lafferty, Lam, R. Lewis, Luedtke, Moon, Platt, M. Washington, Mosby, Tarlau, A. Washington, Lierman, Turner, Ali, D. Barnes, C. Howard, Walker, Wilkins, Patterson, and Carr
Additional Facts:Bill is a Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0594
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Elections
Narrow Subject(s):Constitutional Amendments
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee
Referendum
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Voting -see also- Ballots; Elections
Statutes:Article - I - Elective Franchise
(1, 2, 2A)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 15, 2018 12:50 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20181/26/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/1/20183/1/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/2/20183/2/2018Favorable with Amendments {585467/1 Report Adopted38
Special Order until 3/6 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 38
3/6/20183/6/2018Floor Amendment {273726/1 (Delegate McComas) Rejected (50-84)40
Floor Amendment {883428/1 (Delegate Carr) Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (91-47)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs43
3/22/20183/22/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/20183/20/2018Favorable51
Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 51
3/23/20183/21/2018Favorable Report Adopted52
Floor Amendment {343324/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-34)52
Second Reading Passed52
3/26/20183/22/2018Third Reading Passed (33-14)53
House3/27/20183/20/2018Returned Passed54

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 27, 2018 10:16 A.M.