HB0544

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Choice Policy

Sponsored by:

Delegate Robinson

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Authorizing a student in a public school or nonpublic school to choose not to participate in or observe, in whole or in part, classwork or an assessment that includes certain actions conducted on a certain animal; authorizing a student to choose not to participate in or observe the classwork or assessment at a certain time; requiring a certain student to complete the required classwork or assessment by a certain alternative educational method that meets certain requirements; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Robinson
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0369
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Animals -see also- Birds; Dogs
Discrimination
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Notices
Private Schools
Public Schools
Students
Teachers
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-125)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 16, 2018 2:45 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20181/26/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/30/20181/30/2018Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2/26/20182/26/2018Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 23, 2018 5:10 P.M.