HB0547 (CH0555)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education – Head Start Program – Annual Appropriation (The Ulysses Currie Act)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Barron

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555


Synopsis:Requiring the Head Start Program in the State to be referred to as the Ulysses Currie Head Start Program; and requiring the Governor to include an appropriation of at least $3,000,000 for the Ulysses Currie Head Start Program in each annual budget submission.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Barron, Angel, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Davis, Fennell, Frush, Gaines, Healey, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Knotts, J. Lewis, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Sanchez, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Walker, and A. Washington
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0373
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Names
Statutes:Article - Education
(5-219)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 4:29 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20181/26/2018First Reading Appropriations
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/29/20183/22/2018Favorable with Amendments {434369/1 Report Adopted56
Second Reading Passed with Amendments56
3/30/20183/23/2018Special Order until 4/2 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 57
4/3/20183/25/2018Special Order until later this session (Delegate Jones) Adopted 59
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted59
Floor Amendment {103722/1 (Delegate Walker) Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/4/20183/26/2018Third Reading Passed (128-8)60
Senate4/5/20183/31/2018First Reading Senate Rules62
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/9/20184/3/2018Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/9/20184/4/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)66
House4/10/20184/5/2018Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:36 P.M.