HB0548 (CH0333)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Prekindergarten Student Assessment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Shoemaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333


Synopsis:Authorizing a county board of education to administer the early learning assessment to enrolled prekindergarten students in the county; authorizing the assessment to be administered to a specified student for the purpose of identifying a disability; and requiring a county board to consult with prekindergarten teachers, including teachers nominated by the exclusive bargaining representative, in determining how to implement the assessment.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Shoemaker, D. Barnes, Ebersole, Hornberger, Kittleman, McComas, Morgan, Rose, and Tarlau
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0667
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Auditors and Audits
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Rules and Regulations
Students
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-210)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20171/30/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {295769/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/7/20173/31/2017Third Reading Passed (135-0)65
Senate4/10/20174/2/2017First Reading Senate Rules62
4/10/20174/10/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/4/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted64
Third Reading Passed (44-1)64
House4/10/20174/5/2017Returned Passed70
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:01 P.M.