HB0548

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - Requirements

Sponsored by:

Delegate Healey

Status:

In the House - Passed Enrolled


Synopsis:Providing that a privately owned transportation project in the State that includes the construction of one or more tunnels with a diameter of 6 feet or greater that will be primarily used by a common carrier may not be constructed and the State may not authorize the use of or access to a State-owned right-of-way or State property for the privately owned transportation project, under certain circumstances; and providing for the construction of the Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Healey, B. Barnes, Beidle, Carey, Chang, Frush, Gaines, Holmes, Pena-Melnyk, Simonaire, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, and A. Washington
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1073
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Utility Regulation
Real Property
Narrow Subject(s):Bridges and Tunnels
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Condemnation
Construction
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Mass Transit -see also- Buses; Railroads
Railroads
Reports
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Weights and Measures
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(9-101)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 9:16 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20181/26/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
1/30/20181/30/2018Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {930510/1 Report Adopted61A
Floor Amendment {593524/1 (Delegate Valentino-Smith) Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (95-42)62
Senate4/6/20184/1/2018First Reading Senate Rules63
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Finance
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable with Amendments {517172/1 Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66
4/9/20184/5/2018Special Order until later today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 67
Motion limit debate (Senator Peters) Adopted (34-11)67
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (29-11)67
House4/9/20184/5/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (100-37)70
Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 2:21 P.M.