HB0570

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Alteration and Cost-of-Living Adjustments

Sponsored by:

Delegate Gilchrist

Status:

In the House - Passed Enrolled


Synopsis:Altering the determination of the amount of the standard deduction for an individual under the Maryland income tax; altering the minimum and maximum limitation amounts of certain standard deductions allowed under the Maryland income tax for certain taxable years by a certain cost-of-living adjustment; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Gilchrist, Barve, Beidle, Lafferty, Lisanti, Luedtke, Mosby, Stein, Afzali, Ali, Buckel, Hornberger, Kaiser, Long, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, Tarlau, Turner, and Wilkins
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0896 Session: 2010 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Comptroller
Income Tax
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-217)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 11:09 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {495365/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (135-0)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {489330/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/7/20183/30/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (137-0)64
Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 7, 2018 2:40 P.M.