HB0580

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Clippinger

Status:

In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance


Synopsis:Requiring employers that employ 15 or more employees to provide employees with earned sick and safe leave that is paid at the same rate as the employee normally earns; requiring employers with 14 or fewer employees to provide an employee with unpaid earned sick and safe leave; providing for the manner in which earned sick and safe leave is accrued by the employee and treated by the employer; requiring an employer to allow an employee to use earned sick and safe leave for specified purposes; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Clippinger, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Carr, Carter, Chang, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hammen, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Smith, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, K. Young, P. Young, Zucker, and Queen
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0472
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance
Broad Subject(s):Private Sector Labor and Industry
State Government - Personnel
Narrow Subject(s):Abuse -see also- Child Abuse & Neg.; Elder Abuse & Neg., etc
Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Agriculture -see also- Farmland
Attorneys' Fees
Attorney General
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Construction
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Damages
Discrimination
Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect
Family Law -see also- Adoption; Annulment; Divorce; etc
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Grants
Guardians
Health -see also- Mental Health
Hearings
Identification
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Investigations and Inquiries -see also- Crim Bckgrnd Invest
Jurisdiction
Leave
Legal Aid
Local Government Mandates
Mediation -see also- Arbitration
Mental Health
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notices
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Privacy
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Time
Victims -see also- Criminal Injuries Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Youth -see also- Minors
Statutes:Article - Labor and Employment
(2-106, 3-103, 3-1301 through 3-1311)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:00 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/3/20162/3/2016First Reading Economic Matters
2/8/20162/8/2016Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20163/31/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/31/20163/26/2016Favorable with Amendments {233899/1 Report Adopted58
Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Davis) Adopted 58
4/1/20163/27/2016Floor Committee Amendment {713294/1 Adopted59
Floor Amendment (Delegate Davis) {713723/1 Adopted59
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) {613426/1 Rejected (53-83)59
Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) {973026/1 Rejected (51-83)59
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {643426/1 Rejected (50-82)59
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kittleman) {863928/1 Rejected (52-81)59
Floor Amendment (Delegate Carozza) {783522/1 Rejected (52-81)59
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {153322/1 Rejected (50-79)59
Floor Amendment (Delegate Morgan) {653328/1 Rejected (50-77)59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/4/20163/28/2016Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Kipke) Adopted60
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {323925/1 Rejected (51-83)60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/5/20163/29/2016Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted61
Third Reading Passed (84-54)61
Senate4/6/20163/31/2016First Reading Senate Rules60
4/11/20164/11/2016Rereferred to Finance

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:00 P.M.