HB0622 (CH0386)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines

Sponsored by:

Delegate Patterson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386


Synopsis:Requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health to establish certain guidelines by December 1, 2018, for public schools regarding the administration of health care services to students with sickle cell disease; requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health by December 1, 2018, to provide technical assistance on implementation of the guidelines and to develop a process to monitor implementation of the guidelines; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Patterson, Ali, Angel, D. Barnes, Branch, Brooks, Carr, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Fennell, Gaines, Gibson, Glenn, Haynes, Holmes, C. Howard, Jalisi, Jones, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Queen, Sample-Hughes, Sydnor, Turner, A. Washington, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0161
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Diseases -see also- AIDS; Rabies
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health, Department of
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Job Training -see also- Continuing Education
Jurisdiction
Nurses
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Private Schools
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Schools
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Rules and Regulations
Students
Teachers
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-441)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 3:30 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/30/20181/30/2018Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2/22/20182/22/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2/23/20182/23/2018Favorable with Amendments {305765/1 Report Adopted33
Second Reading Passed with Amendments33
2/27/20182/27/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)35
Senate2/28/20182/28/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs36
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments {994935/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
3/30/20183/27/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)58
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61
Third Reading Passed (138-0)61
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.