HB0631 (CH0818)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Health - Essential Off-Patent or Generic Drugs - Price Gouging - Prohibition

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 818


Synopsis:Prohibiting a manufacturer or wholesale distributor from engaging in price gouging in the sale of an essential off-patent or generic drug; establishing that it is not a violation of a specified provision of the Act for a wholesale distributor to increase a price of an essential off-patent or generic drug under specified circumstances; authorizing the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to notify the Attorney General of an increase in the price of an essential off-patent or generic drug under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Delegates Bromwell, Anderson, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Brooks, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jameson, Jones, Kelly, Knotts, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Vallario, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, C. Wilson, K. Young, P. Young, Pendergrass, Angel, Kipke, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Saab, West, Aumann, Carey, Mautz, and S. Howard
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0415
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Economic Matters
Finance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Attorney General
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Federal Government
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Industry and Technology
Medical Assistance
Notices
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Privacy
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Time
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(2-801 through 2-803)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20171/30/2017First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
3/20/20173/20/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/20/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments {376789/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/20/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (137-4)51
Senate3/21/20173/19/2017First Reading Finance48
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/5/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {247274/1 Report Adopted59
Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Feldman) Adopted 59
4/6/20173/31/2017Floor Amendment {943322/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/7/20174/1/2017Floor Amendment {683326/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-32)61
Floor Amendment {893327/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-31)61
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-7)61
House4/10/20174/2/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (137-2)67
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 818

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 30, 2017 12:54 P.M.