HB0633 (CH0423)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records

Sponsored by:

Delegate Healey

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423


Synopsis:Enabling private entities to accept the use of a certain substitute address by a victim of domestic abuse who is a participant in an address confidentiality program; requiring any person to accept a certain address of a participant in an address confidentiality program as the address of the participant; prohibiting a person from knowingly and intentionally seeking and obtaining the actual address or telephone number of a participant in an address confidentiality program; requiring the Secretary of State to adopt regulations; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Healey, Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Secretary of State), and Delegates Anderton, Beidle, Carr, Cassilly, Clark, Flanagan, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Holmes, Jacobs, Jalisi, Knotts, Lafferty, R. Lewis, McCray, McMillan, Otto, Robinson, Stein, and Wivell
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0578
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Real Property
Family Law
Narrow Subject(s):Disclosure
Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect
Financial Institutions -see also- Banks; Credit Unions; etc.
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Land Records -see also- Deeds
Notices
Postal Service
Privacy
Real Property
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Cybersecurity; Occupational Safety
Secretary of State
Telephones
Victims -see also- Criminal Injuries Compensation
Statutes:Article - Family Law
(4-519, 4-520, 4-521 through 4-524, 4-525, 4-526, 4-527, 4-528, 4-529, 4-530)
Article - Real Property
(3-101, 3-114 through 3-120)
Article - State Government
(7-301, 7-302, 7-303 through 7-306, 7-307, 7-308, 7-309, 7-310, 7-311, 7-312)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:58 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
1/30/20181/30/2018Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {670012/1 Report Adopted40
Floor Amendment {113324/2 (Delegate Wilson) Rejected (66-71)40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings43
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
House4/3/20183/25/2018Returned Passed59
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.