HB0642 (CH0628)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Sewage Leaks - Posting Requirements MC/PG 114-13

Sponsored by:

Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628


Synopsis:Requiring the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to post warning signs at each public access point to a waterway that is contaminated by a leak in a sanitary line, pipe, or fixture that is connected to the sanitary sewer system of the Commission within 24 hours after a leak is reported; requiring a warning sign to include the source and date of discovery of the leak and specified contact information of the Commission; requiring the Commission to post the warning signs downstream from the leak; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Environmental Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Bi-County Agencies
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Forests and Parks -see also- Program Open Space; Trees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances -see also- Asbestos; Radiatn
Parking
Public Information
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Signs and Billboards
Sports and Recreation
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Water
Statutes:Article - Public Utilities
(24-202)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
3/5/20133/5/2013Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20133/21/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {860913/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)53
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.