HB0642 (CH0012)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required Findings

Sponsored by:

Delegate Wilson, C.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12


Synopsis:Altering the statute of limitations on civil actions arising out of an alleged incident or incidents of sexual abuse that occurred while the victim was a minor; establishing a statute of repose for specified civil actions relating to child sexual abuse; providing that, in a specified action filed more than a specified number of years after the victim reaches the age of majority, damages may be awarded against a person or governmental entity that is not an alleged perpetrator only under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates C. Wilson, Angel, Atterbeary, Bromwell, Folden, C. Howard, and Moon
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0505
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Civil Actions and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Age of Majority -see also- Minors
Child Abuse and Neglect
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Damages
Statutes of Limitation
Torts -see also- Libel and Slander; Med Malp; Wrongful Death
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(5-117, 5-304)
Article - State Government
(12-106)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2017 5:32 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20172/1/2017First Reading Judiciary
2/2/20172/2/2017Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/16/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {252810/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/17/20173/14/2017Third Reading Passed (140-0)48
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings46A
3/23/20173/23/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/23/20173/21/2017Favorable Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed50
3/24/20173/22/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)51
House3/27/20173/22/2017Returned Passed56
Post Passage4/4/20174/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 4, 2017 2:38 P.M.