HB0652 (CH0446)

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - Commissioner Terms MC/PG 105-15

Sponsored by:

Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446


Synopsis:Authorizing a commissioner appointed from Montgomery County to be appointed for a maximum of three consecutive full terms as a member of the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission if the commissioner is designated as chair of the Montgomery County Planning board during the commissioner's second term in office; and providing for the retroactive application of the Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Bi-County Agencies
Narrow Subject(s):County Commissioners
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Montgomery County
Statutes:Article - Land Use
(15-102)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:43 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/12/20152/12/2015First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/26/20152/26/2015Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20153/23/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/23/20153/20/2015Favorable with Amendments {310217/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/23/20153/21/2015Third Reading Passed (136-3)51
Senate3/24/20153/21/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48
3/25/20153/25/2015Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20154/9/2015Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20154/3/2015Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/11/20154/4/2015Third Reading Passed (45-0)62
House4/13/20154/7/2015Returned Passed68
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:43 P.M.