HB0668 (CH0684)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Preschool Development Grants - Expansion Grants - Required State Funding

Sponsored by:

Delegate Rosenberg

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684


Synopsis:Requiring the Governor to include in the State budget specified funding in a specified amount for each fiscal year in which the State Department of Education receives an Expansion Grant through the federal Preschool Development Grants Program.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Rosenberg and Platt
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0584
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Children
Education - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Education, State Department of
Federal Government
Governor
Grants
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-101.3)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/4/20162/4/2016First Reading Appropriations
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable Report by Appropriations
3/17/20163/15/2016Favorable Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed47
3/19/20163/17/2016Third Reading Passed (93-41)49
Senate3/21/20163/18/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation47A
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
3/25/20163/25/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20163/31/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/31/20163/27/2016Favorable Report Adopted56A
Second Reading Passed56A
4/1/20163/28/2016Third Reading Passed (31-14)57
House4/1/20163/27/2016Returned Passed59
Post Passage5/28/20165/28/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:01 P.M.