HB0677 (CH0039)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone Numbers

Sponsored by:

Delegate Pena-Melnyk

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39


Synopsis:Requiring a custodian to deny inspection of a distribution list and a request to be added to a distribution list that identifies a physical address, an e-mail address, or a telephone number of an individual that is used by a governmental entity or an elected official for the sole purpose of periodically sending news about certain activities or sending informational notices or emergency alerts; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Beidle, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Ghrist, Gilchrist, Healey, Holmes, Hornberger, Jacobs, R. Lewis, Mautz, Otto, Robinson, Sample-Hughes, Sydnor, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, Wivell, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pendergrass, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, West, and K. Young
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0477
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Emergency Bills
Emergencies
Identification
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Notices
Postal Service
Privacy
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Telephones
Statutes:Article - General Provisions
(4-341)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 4:35 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/31/20181/31/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2/2/20182/2/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/7/20183/7/2018Favorable with Amendments {316183/1 Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (132-4)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs43
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed47
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018Returned Passed50
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:59 P.M.