HB0684 (CH0006)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - State Grants for Education Aid

Sponsored by:

Delegate Krebs

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6


Synopsis:Establishing the criteria for a county board of education to be eligible to receive supplemental prekindergarten State grants in fiscal years 2018 through 2020; making specified grants to Baltimore City Public Schools subject to Baltimore City providing specified local contributions; requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to make specified disbursements; requiring a specified audit; requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to develop a specified financial recovery plan; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Krebs, Anderson, Beitzel, Ciliberti, Conaway, Glenn, Hayes, Jacobs, Kittleman, Lierman, McCray, McIntosh, Oaks, Rose, Rosenberg, Shoemaker, and M. Washington
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1024
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Grants
Kent County
Public Schools
Reports
Statutes:Article - Education
(5-202, 5-218)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20172/1/2017First Reading Appropriations
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/14/20173/11/2017Favorable with Amendments {784664/1 Report Adopted45
Floor Amendment {683321/1 (Delegate M. Washington) Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20173/12/2017Third Reading Passed (124-13)46A
Senate3/16/20173/16/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation45
3/21/20173/21/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/27/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments {849838/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/28/20173/24/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)53
House3/28/20173/24/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments58
Third Reading Passed (129-8)58
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/3/20174/3/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:02 P.M.