HB0695 (CH0096)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreements - Economic Development Projects

Sponsored by:

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96


Synopsis:Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County, on or before June 30, 2010, to enter into an agreement with the owner of a specified economic development project that provides a specified economic benefit for a payment in lieu of the county real and personal property tax; authorizing the owner of the economic development project and the county to modify the payment in lieu of taxes agreement entered into on or before June 30, 2020, under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Anne Arundel County Delegation
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0930
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Property - Local
Narrow Subject(s):Anne Arundel County
Commercial Rehabilitation -see also- Urban Renewal
Property Tax
Statutes:Article - Tax - Property
(7-520)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2017 4:39 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20172/1/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/10/20172/10/2017Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/18/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments {565969/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (140-0)51
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation46A
3/24/20173/24/2017Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/3/20173/28/2017Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/4/20173/29/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)58
House4/4/20173/28/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage4/11/20174/11/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.