HB0736 (CH0217)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacies and Pharmacists - Information on and Sales of Prescription Drugs

Sponsored by:

Delegate Bromwell

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217


Synopsis:Prohibiting a pharmacy benefits manager from prohibiting a pharmacy or pharmacist from providing a beneficiary with information regarding the retail price of a prescription drug or the amount of the cost share for a prescription drug for which the beneficiary is responsible; prohibiting a pharmacy benefits manager from prohibiting a pharmacy or pharmacist from discussing with a beneficiary a certain retail price or certain cost share for a prescription drug; providing for the construction of the Act; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Bromwell, Anderton, Pendergrass, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0576
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Insurance - Health
Health Occupations
Narrow Subject(s):Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Retail Sales
Statutes:Article - Insurance
(15-1611)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 27, 2018 12:55 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/14/20182/14/2018Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {556082/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (134-0)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20183/28/2018Favorable Report by Finance
3/28/20183/24/2018Favorable Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed55
3/29/20183/26/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)57
House3/30/20183/23/2018Returned Passed57
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.