HB0767

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices

Sponsored by:

Delegate Sydnor

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings


Synopsis:Requiring a custodian of records to deny inspection of the part of a recording from a specified body-worn digital recording device worn by a law enforcement officer regarding specified individuals; requiring specified notification of specified individuals; requiring the Police Training and Standards Commission to develop specified uniform standards and policies in consultation with specified groups; requiring a custodian of records to allow inspection of a recording under specified circumstances; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Sydnor, Conaway, Dumais, and Reilly
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0970
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0947 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Attorney General
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Evidence
Identification
Inspections -see also- Motor Vehicle Inspection
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Notices
Photography
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Rules and Regulations
Victims -see also- Criminal Injuries Compensation
Video
Statutes:Article - General Provisions
(4-101, 4-356)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Judiciary
2/7/20172/7/2017Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/14/20173/11/2017Favorable with Amendments {882519/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20173/12/2017Third Reading Passed (133-3)46A
Senate3/16/20173/16/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings45
3/23/20173/23/2017Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:02 P.M.