HB0771 (CH0277)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Administration of Diabetes Care Services - Guidelines

Sponsored by:

Delegate Barnes, D.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277


Synopsis:Requiring the State Department of Education and the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish specified guidelines for the administration of specified health care services to specified students with diabetes; requiring the State Department of Education and the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish a specified plan and make a report, on or before December 1, 2016, to specified committees of the General Assembly on implementation of the plan to provide diabetes care services to specified students; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates D. Barnes, Angel, B. Barnes, Buckel, Fennell, Hornberger, Kelly, Long, Luedtke, Metzgar, Patterson, Platt, Reilly, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Walker, and A. Washington
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0071
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0992 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Diseases -see also- AIDS; Rabies
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Job Training
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Nurses
Private Schools
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
Students
Telephones
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-426.4)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate4/11/20164/8/2016Committee Amendment {564832/1 Withdrawn68
House2/8/20162/8/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2/12/20162/12/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/17/20162/17/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20164/1/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/1/20163/27/2016Favorable with Amendments {325569/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/4/20163/28/2016Third Reading Passed (135-0)60
Senate4/4/20163/29/2016First Reading Senate Rules58
4/8/20164/8/2016Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/11/20164/11/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/11/20164/7/2016Favorable with Amendments {564832/1 Report Adopted67
Favorable with Amendments {564832/1 Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed with Amendments67
4/11/20164/8/2016Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted68
Second Reading Passed68
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted (46-0)68
Third Reading Passed (46-0)68
House4/11/20164/9/2016Returned Passed72
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:02 P.M.