HB0778

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program Process

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, M.

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules


Synopsis:Requiring the State Department of Education to convene a workgroup in consultation with specified stakeholders to review specified statutes and regulations, make specified determinations, and discuss specified issues; requiring the workgroup to review and make recommendations regarding the feasibility of authorizing a student with a disability to attend a specified public school; requiring the workgroup to report the results of its activities to specified committees of the General Assembly by November 15, 2016; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates M. Washington and Luedtke
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingRules
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Hearings, Office of
Assessments
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Discipline
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Foster Care
Hearings
Judges
Mediation -see also- Arbitration
Notices
Public Schools
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Witnesses
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20162/8/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20164/8/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/9/20164/3/2016Favorable with Amendments {565960/1 Report Adopted66A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66A
4/9/20164/4/2016Third Reading Passed (136-0)67
Senate4/11/20164/3/2016First Reading Senate Rules63A

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:02 P.M.