HB0786 (CH0583)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Individualized or Group Behavioral Counseling Services - Establishment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Angel

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583


Synopsis:Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in conjunction with the State Department of Education, to recommend best practices for county boards of education to provide to students specified needs assessments and specified behavioral health counseling services; providing that county boards may not be required to provide specified assessments or counseling services; prohibiting specified insurance policies or contracts from denying a covered medically necessary behavioral health care service for a specified student; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Angel, Morales, Branch, Cullison, Davis, Glenn, C. Howard, Korman, A. Miller, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Sanchez, A. Washington, and Wilkins
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Insurance - Health
Narrow Subject(s):Counselors -see also- Guidance Counselors; Social Workers
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Maintenance Organizations -see also- Manage Care Orgs
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Public Schools
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-440)
Article - Insurance
(15-510)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:02 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/14/20172/14/2017Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {745265/1 Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/20/20173/16/2017Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted50
Floor Amendment {983327/1 (Delegate Cullison) Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/20/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (140-0)51
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable with Amendments {534636/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/10/20174/2/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)62
House4/10/20174/3/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Third Reading Passed (140-0)68
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:02 P.M.