HB0798 (CH0311)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Visual Impairments - Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kittleman

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311


Synopsis:Requiring certain vision screenings to be given in the year that a student enters a school system, enters the first grade, and enters the eighth or ninth grade unless evidence is presented that a student has been tested by an optometrist or ophthalmologist within the past year; requiring the results of certain screenings be given to the parents or guardians of certain students with certain educational materials; and requiring that certain additional information be provided to parents or guardians of students who fail a certain vision screening.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Kittleman, Barkley, Hill, Metzgar, Pena-Melnyk, Rose, Sample-Hughes, Shoemaker, Valentino-Smith, K. Young, Tarlau, and Ebersole
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Continuing Education -see also- Job Training
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Evidence
Examinations
Forms
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health, Department of
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Job Training -see also- Continuing Education
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Local Government Mandates
Medical Assistance
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Ophthalmologists
Optometrists
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Private Schools
Public Information
Public Schools
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Students
Teachers
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-404)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 2:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/6/20182/6/2018Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable with Amendments {195769/1 Report Adopted44
Floor Amendment {153827/1 (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)46
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:57 P.M.