HB0807 (CH0330)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Distribution

Sponsored by:

Delegate Beidle

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330


Synopsis:Altering the amounts of and process for appropriating highway user funds that are required to be distributed to Baltimore City, counties, and municipalities in certain fiscal years; requiring that certain capital highway grants may be made only under certain circumstances; requiring that in certain fiscal years highway user revenues are required to be used as authorized under the Transportation Trust Fund; repealing certain obsolete distributions of highway user revenues and transfers of highway user revenues for certain fiscal years; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Beidle, Anderton, Adams, Arentz, Barve, Beitzel, Fraser-Hidalgo, Ghrist, Holmes, Hornberger, Jacobs, Jalisi, Lafferty, McCray, Morgan, Otto, Pena-Melnyk, Rose, Shoemaker, Stein, Tarlau, Carr, Cassilly, Clark, Flanagan, Folden, Frush, Gilchrist, Healey, R. Lewis, McMillan, Robinson, Wivell, and K. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0516
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0942 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018, July 1, 2019
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Transportation - Highways
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Baltimore City
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Grants
Highways
Motor Vehicle Registration
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Prince George's County
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(8-401, 8-402, 8-403, 8-404, 8-405)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 18, 2018 10:07 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {480411/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation43
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {659736/1 Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)59
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61
Third Reading Passed (137-0)61
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:57 P.M.