HB0808

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education – Collective Bargaining for Noncertificated Employees – Supervisory Employees and Management Personnel

Sponsored by:

Delegate Tarlau

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)


Synopsis:Altering the definitions of "supervisory employee" and "management personnel" by removing a provision that status as a supervisory employee and management personnel may be determined by certain negotiations between a certain public school employer and a certain employee organization.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Tarlau, Ebersole, and Luedtke
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Education - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Collective Bargaining
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Schools
Statutes:Article - Education
(6-501)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 11:17 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed44
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (93-44)46
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/2/20183/28/2018Favorable with Amendments {427671/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14)60
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61A
Third Reading Passed (91-41)61A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20185/25/2018Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.