HB0814 (CH0207)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning Experiences

Sponsored by:

Delegate Patterson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207


Synopsis:Authorizing all county boards of education, rather than only certain county boards of education, to waive the requirement that a participating employer reimburse the county for the cost of the premium for workers' compensation coverage provided to students placed in unpaid work-based learning experiences or pay a certain fee.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Patterson, Afzali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Clark, Dumais, Fisher, Ghrist, Glass, Hornberger, C. Howard, Jackson, Jacobs, Jameson, Lisanti, Long, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Proctor, Reilly, Rey, Rose, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Wilson
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0403
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Workers' Compensation
Education - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Reimbursement Rates
Students
Workers' Compensation
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-114)
Article - Labor and Employment
(9-228)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 8:56 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20183/8/2018Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed44
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)46
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable Report by Finance
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
3/30/20183/27/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)58
House4/2/20183/24/2018Returned Passed58
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.