HB0888

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator

Sponsored by:

Delegate Moon

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from transporting a certain rapid fire trigger activator into the State or manufacturing, possessing, selling, offering to sell, transferring, purchasing, or receiving a certain rapid fire trigger activator, subject to a certain exception; defining "rapid fire trigger activator" as any device, including a removable manual or power-driven activating device, constructed so that, when installed in or attached to a firearm the rate at which the trigger is activated increases or the rate of fire increases; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Moon, J. Lewis, Walker, Ali, Anderson, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Busch, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gibson, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Jackson, Jalisi, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, Wilson, K. Young, and P. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0707
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Guns
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(4-301, 4-306, 4-305.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 29, 2018 11:23 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Judiciary
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2/19/20182/19/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable with Amendments {642411/1 Report Adopted44
Special Order until next session (Delegate Afzali) Adopted 44
3/14/20183/11/2018Floor Amendment {553221/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (50-87)45
Floor Amendment {243325/1 (Delegate S. Howard) Rejected (37-96)45
Floor Amendment {553823/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (44-91)45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (128-7)46A
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48A
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Floor Amendment {243826/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (18-28)61
Floor Amendment {603625/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-29)61
Floor Amendment {703223/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-30)61
Floor Amendment {323627/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-28)61
Floor Amendment {963123/1 (Senator Salling) Rejected (16-30)61
Third Reading Passed (35-11)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/25/20185/25/2018Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:56 P.M.