HB0920 (CH0335)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Primary and Secondary Education - Certificated School Personnel - Training Requirement

Sponsored by:

Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335


Synopsis:Requiring the State Board of Education to require, beginning on or before July 1, 2018, all certificated school personnel who have direct contact with students on a regular basis to complete training, by December 1 of each year, in specified knowledge and skills required to understand and respond to youth suicide risk and identify specified resources to help students in crisis; prohibiting a person from bringing a specified action against a county board except under specified circumstances;
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo and Pena-Melnyk
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0921 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Continuing Education -see also- Job Training
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Rules and Regulations
Students
Teachers
Statutes:Article - Education
(6-704.1, 6-122)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:03 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20172/6/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/10/20172/10/2017Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
3/9/20173/9/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/10/20173/10/2017Favorable with Amendments {865264/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/14/20173/11/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)45
Senate3/15/20173/15/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs44
3/20/20173/20/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable with Amendments {504230/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)63A
House4/10/20174/5/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Third Reading Passed (135-0)70
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:03 P.M.