HB0999 (CH0702)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kaiser

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 702


Synopsis:Establishing the Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education; requiring specified appointments to be made to ensure diversity within the Commission; requiring the Commission to review the findings and recommendations of a specified study, review specified education finance formulas, and review specified accountability measures; requiring a specified master plan to include specified information for calendar years 2016 and 2017; requiring the State Department of Education to convene a specified stakeholders group; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Kaiser, D. Barnes, Ebersole, Fennell, Hixson, C. Howard, Jones, Luedtke, McIntosh, Patterson, Platt, Tarlau, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0905
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Apprentices
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Special Education
Students
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:03 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20162/10/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20162/12/2016Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {605663/2 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20163/16/2016Third Reading Passed (138-0)48
Senate3/21/20163/18/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation47A
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20164/6/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/6/20163/31/2016Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)61
House4/7/20164/1/2016Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/28/20165/28/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 702

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:03 P.M.