HB1012 (CH0289)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Tax Credit - Commuter Benefits - Eligibility and Credit Amount

Sponsored by:

Delegate McCray

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289


Synopsis:Increasing the maximum allowable amount per employee of the income and insurance premium tax credit for a business's cost of providing commuter benefits for its employees from $50 to $100 per individual employee per month; and altering the minimum seating capacity of a vehicle that may be used to provide qualifying commuter benefits for purposes of the income and insurance premium tax credit from eight to six.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates McCray, Lierman, Barron, Beidle, Bromwell, Brooks, Busch, Cullison, Fennell, Frush, Gaines, Hettleman, Hixson, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, Luedtke, Moon, Morhaim, Reznik, B. Robinson, Stein, A. Washington, M. Washington, Tarlau, Kaiser, Ebersole, Afzali, and Platt
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Transportation - Generally
Narrow Subject(s):Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Commuters -see also- Car Pools
Income Tax
Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Statutes:Article - Environment
(2-901)
Article - Insurance
(6-120)
Article - Tax - General
(10-715)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 18, 2016 4:55 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20162/10/2016First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2/12/20162/12/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.
3/16/20163/16/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {885864/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/19/20163/17/2016Third Reading Passed (130-3)49
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Budget and Taxation48A
3/23/20163/23/2016Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20163/29/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
4/9/20164/9/2016Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/9/20164/3/2016Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/11/20164/4/2016Floor Amendment (Senator Ferguson) {313525/1 Adopted64
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)64
House4/11/20164/6/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments69
Third Reading Passed (138-0)69
Passed Enrolled69
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 26, 2016 12:48 P.M.